Trustees VICTORIA CENTRE
Charity number: 278215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annia Matereke | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allan Blackman | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victor James | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
NILESH PATEL | Trustee | 06 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ekins | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Abram | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zulquanain Tony Aslam | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Jackson | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.