SWAFFIELD SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 278265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.27k £29.01k £23.28k £19.32k £13.25k
Total expenditure £9.73k £24.91k £22.07k £21.77k £27.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A