THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S NEWDIGATE

Charity number: 278650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.21k £16.77k £18.77k £23.80k £19.10k
Total expenditure £2.95k £3.29k £60.37k £3.24k £23.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A