ST LEONARD LODGE NO 1766 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 278798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.27k £10.20k £12.40k £10.80k £4.54k
Total expenditure £3.27k £8.95k £13.57k £11.54k £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A