Trustees THE VEGAN SOCIETY
Charity number: 279228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paras Shah | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joe Terence Hughes | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amber Vincent-Prior | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mx Christine Zuleka Audrey McLaren | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Eileen Feehan | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robert de Verneuil Smith | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donald Lee | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mellissa Beatrice Morgan | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Hedley Gore | Trustee | 28 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Mary Vinell | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.