Trustees 1ST LEIGHTON BUZZARD SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 279330
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Godden | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Arthur Summerfield | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stanley Redfern | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Goddard | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Karen Buckley | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.