TREES (THE RESIDENTS ENJOYMENT AND ENTERTAINMENT SOCIETY)

Charity number: 279568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £17.56k £19.39k £22.87k £15.59k £2.99k
Total expenditure £22.67k £20.82k £20.09k £15.26k £6.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A