Governing document THE CLARE ANCIENT HOUSE MUSEUM
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JANUARY 1979, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 27 JANUARY 1997, 22 JULY 1997, 1 JUNE 1998, 15 JANUARY 2001 AND 6 DECEM BER 2004
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN CLARE FOR THE PROVISION OF AND EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF SPECIMENS OF ARCHAEOLOGY GEOLOGY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF THE DISTRICT. (B) THE EXTENSION ENHANCEMENT MAINTENANCE AND STORAGE OF THE COLLECTIONS OF THE MUSEUM. (C) THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY LECTURES AND OTHER FACILITIES OF EDUCATION. (D) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH RELATING TO THE COLLECTIONS OF THE MUSEUM AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
CLARE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.