Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL AND COLLEGE LEADERS BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 279628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CAMP | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|||||
ALAN BRADY | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE THOMAS | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAM ROBERTS | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Theo Nickson | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BRIERLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
C M BALDAM | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Cooper | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL BERTENSHAW | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN MULLINS BA FRSA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.