THE FRIENDS OF WEST STOW ANGLO SAXON SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 279700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.88k £1.97k £2.14k £1.76k £969
Total expenditure £6.30k £1.34k £1.55k £630 £316
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A