CANTERBURY THEATRE AND FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity number: 279714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £934.37k £722.05k £780.91k £776.79k £632.41k
Total expenditure £852.62k £746.79k £850.38k £793.94k £729.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £264.30k £221.08k £37.96k £5.56k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £329.19k £74.41k £95.40k £113.98k £98.70k
Income - Other trading activities £124.57k £149.64k £161.73k £448.30k £193.40k
Income - Charitable activities £477.15k £490.34k £511.66k £448.30k £339.84k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.46k £7.66k £12.14k £179 £470
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £677.75k £586.74k £672.38k £647.25k £715.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £92.81k £85.09k £140.67k £5.60k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £6.85k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.23k £131 £10 £37 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £67.24k £92.90k £6.02k £7.78k