RECREATION GROUND - DRINKSTONE

Charity number: 279928
Charity reporting is overdue by 1767 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 306 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 306 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 672 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 672 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1037 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1037 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1402 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1402 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1767 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1767 days