Governing document THE EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION FOR DIGITAL HUMANITIES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/04/1980 AS AMENDED ON 07/06/1982 AS AMENDED ON 03/06/1987 AS AMENDED ON 04/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 15/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE DIGITAL HUMANITIES, THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF COMPUTATIONAL METHODS IN RESEARCH AND TEACHING IN THE HUMANITIES AND RELATED EDUCATIONAL DISCIPLINES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE BUT NOT LIMITED TO LINGUISTIC COMPUTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.