BADWELL ASH PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 279997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £8.09k £3.61k £5.90k £6.48k £1.52k
Total expenditure £5.96k £4.91k £5.40k £6.92k £3.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A