Trustees NORTHBOURNE PARK SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 280048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Barter | Chair | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Townsend | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Doran | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pierre Julian Seydoux | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Cartwright | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Holland | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hendy | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Millicent Aylward | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Marmet | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jo-Anne Tharp-Skelton | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Stefa Buras-Rees | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Keir | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marian Jane Nairac | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Poole | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.