ST MARK'S OVERSEAS AID TRUST

Charity number: 280091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.80k £18.77k £20.93k £22.35k £16.62k
Total expenditure £19.79k £17.75k £20.44k £21.49k £17.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A