LANGLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 280104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £50.95k £41.94k £39.73k £51.72k £38.10k
Total expenditure £49.64k £32.67k £28.79k £72.53k £157.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A