The Arts Society Dulwich

Charity number: 280129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £5.42k £5.83k £6.97k £6.97k £4.25k
Total expenditure £6.98k £5.69k £6.49k £6.49k £3.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A