THE ANDERTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 280302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £12.17k £4.61k £4.55k £15.23k £18.91k
Total expenditure £10.43k £9.28k £5.50k £24.19k £19.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A