Governing document SALISBURY ART AND SCIENCE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 30TH NOVEMBER 1979 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 5TH MARCH 1981 AND 2ND JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION (CONCURRED WITH BY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS UNDER S.74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 22 APRIL 2002). AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
21. APPLICATION OF INCOME. (1) SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF THE EXPENSES AFORESAID, THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG PEOPLE OF 16 AND OVER WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE RECENTLY BEEN ENGAGED IN A COURSE OF LEARNING WITHIN THE SALISBURY AREA BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WITH THE COSTS OF EDUCATION AND EXTRA-CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES UNDERTAKEN IN CONNECTION WITH THAT EDUCATION, OR WITH THE COSTS OF PREPARING TO ENTER A TRADE, PROFESSION OR OTHER OCCUPATION ON LEAVING THAT EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
SALISBURY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.