Trustees AVON WILDLIFE TRUST
Charity number: 280422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lara Burch | Chair | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Sumita Hutchison | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Karen Hills | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Lyne | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jayne Burgess | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Francis Hogg | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ross Fairley | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Pedram Hamed Asgarian | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Katy Elzabeth Leahy | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Daniel Steer | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Rutter | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Zac Nicholson | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.