THE RHIANNON TRUST

Charity number: 280724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.10k £10.50k £9.90k £9.90k £9.90k
Total expenditure £4.90k £17.35k £12.00k £2.50k £10.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A