Trustees 10TH DEAL (EASTRY) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 280777
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Day | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Page | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN PORTER PhD | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Louise Baker | Trustee | 06 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Mitchell | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR Elinor Porter | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marion Wanstall | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bodman | Trustee | 16 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
Dr GRAHAM BAKER PhD MBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER BODMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.