11TH ITCHEN SOUTH (WESTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 280780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.08k £11.89k £10.31k £5.87k £18.51k
Total expenditure £11.34k £9.13k £20.14k £7.07k £8.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k