Financial history CHINGFORD AMATEUR DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 280809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £46.20k £67.62k £55.01k £69.60k £80.89k
Total expenditure £56.55k £69.49k £60.16k £21.90k £67.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.67k £3.93k N/A £28.10k £13.63k