FROME TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 280843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 October 2018 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required