THE FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S SCHOOL, WINCHMORE HILL

Charity number: 281060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £44.64k £37.73k £59.62k £52.38k £34.72k
Total expenditure £37.29k £29.66k £80.13k £46.95k £42.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A