ST MARY'S CHURCH TOLLESBURY BELL-RINGING SOCIETY

Charity number: 281143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.09k £588 £877 £443 £335
Total expenditure £923 £434 £497 £953 £441
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A