Trustees ST CATHERINE'S HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity number: 281362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Diana Lesley Riley Trustee 29 November 2022
None on record
John Philip Abbott Trustee 29 November 2022
None on record
Philip Alexander Ingleby Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Richard Martin Griffin Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Kate Midgley Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record
Gregory Andrews Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record
Nicola Neal-Smith Trustee 23 October 2017
WEST SUSSEX MEDIATION SERVICE
Received: 22 days late
Catherine Blackburn Trustee 17 October 2016
None on record
Alison Livesley Trustee 17 October 2016
None on record