Trustees ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF THE BURTON ART GALLERY
Charity number: 281466
Charity reporting is up to date (176 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Jean Lilian Thompson | Chair | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Graeme Keeble | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Pamela Winifred Cantle | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Toghill | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James William Jackson | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Sarah Catherine Marshall | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Thompson | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Cartledge | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Howell | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
IRENE HAHN | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.