ROCK VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 281599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.61k £13.49k £13.58k £13.36k £15.59k
Total expenditure £9.26k £11.26k £9.14k £10.89k £7.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k