Trustees LODDON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 281671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher James Smit | Chair | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Luke-Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joy Jarvis | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nicholas Poston | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kamaljit Kaur Bhogal | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Phillips MA Ed NPQH | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Shaw | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.