NANPEAN PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 281833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.96k £1.70k £1.27k £1.42k £51.71k
Total expenditure £3.65k £1.64k £2.31k £1.31k £52.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £51.00k