Trustees THE POCKET TESTAMENT LEAGUE LIMITED

Charity number: 281910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Mark Andrew Wiltshire Chair 25 February 1994
BROMLEY CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Received: On time
ASSEMBLIES OF GOD INCORPORATED
Received: On time
EAST - WEST MINISTRIES
Received: On time
Rev Timothy James Rowlands Trustee 14 February 2024
None on record
Michael Brickley Trustee 16 April 2021
None on record
Richard Thomas Garner Trustee 18 September 2019
PRAYER EXPEDITIONS LIMITED
Overdue by 163 days
HEATHER FRANCES SHEPHEARD Trustee 23 July 1999
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ST FRANCIS, BARCOMBE
Received: On time
MARJORIE MAY MURPHY Trustee 20 October 1995
STARFISH ASIA
Received: On time