Financial history WEST LONDON MISSION HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 281929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.32m £1.31m £1.37m £1.54m £1.76m
Total expenditure £1.42m £1.34m £1.40m £1.62m £1.80m
Income from government contracts £890.82k £917.64k £900.00k N/A £939.95k
Income from government grants £148.52k £79.41k N/A £20.42k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £17.25k £48.42k £0 £0 £187.84k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.30m £1.26m £1.21m £1.54m £1.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £7.41k
Income - Other £0 £0 £164.38k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £39.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.34m £1.32m £1.62m £1.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.21k £6.15k £9.60k £10.30k £11.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £71.41k £0 £0