Financial history THE GRAND CHARITY

Charity number: 281942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.56m £12.06m £13.48m £8.47m £10.57m
Total expenditure £10.70m £11.84m £13.24m £9.75m £9.58m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.50m £12.01m £13.20m £8.45m £10.57m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £375.00k £46.00k £278.00k £28.00k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.09m £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.70m £11.84m £13.24m £9.75m £9.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £2.79m £2.93m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0