SIRI GURU SINGH SABHA, CROYDON

Charity number: 282163
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £128.94k £121.40k £101.13k £91.72k £103.83k
Total expenditure £73.82k £82.98k £82.01k £69.68k £77.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A