Financial history THE WORLD FEDERATION OF KHOJA SHIA ITHNA-ASHERI MUSLIM COMMUNITIES

Charity number: 282303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.40m £18.18m £12.72m £15.84m £10.54m
Total expenditure £16.82m £18.10m £13.32m £13.93m £11.46m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £17.47m £17.88m £12.60m £15.81m £10.51m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £70.16k £24.98k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £265.89k £302.14k £115.74k £37.10k £33.52k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £50.03k £16.69k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.82m £18.10m £13.32m £13.93m £11.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £31.86k £35.18k £39.17k £42.30k £51.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.53m £14.12m £9.29m £7.88m £7.29m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0