Financial history LONIA LIMITED

Charity number: 282336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.52m £1.79m £1.93m £1.89m £2.06m
Total expenditure £1.62m £1.65m £1.80m £2.52m £2.36m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.52m £1.79m £1.93m £1.89m £2.06m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.11m £1.29m £1.95m £2.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £406.76k £536.91k £510.31k £574.96k £258.52k
Expenditure - Governance £4.50k £1.70k £3.50k £1.80k £1.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.21m £1.11m £1.28m £1.94m £2.10m
Expenditure - Investment management £406.76k £536.91k £510.31k £574.96k £258.52k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0