Governing document HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE TRUST COMMITTEE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JANUARY 1981, AS AMENDED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1983, 24TH FEBRUARY 1988, 27TH JULY 1988 AND 13TH SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR MAY BE DEEMED CHARITABLE WITHIN THE DISTRICT OF PENWITH SITUATE IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL AND ESPECIALLY THE PARISHES OF HAYLE, ST ERTH AND GWINEAR-GWITHIAN AND (B) MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE HAYLE DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF PENWITH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.