Trustees 22ND GILLINGHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 282509
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA HALL | Chair | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Brown | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Vesey | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Price | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Lamb | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATT CHINN | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP GARDNER | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANKY LEGGATE | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SYD GRINNELL | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MIKE MOUNT | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ISAACS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN BURROWS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.