ST MARY'S CHILTON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 282653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.72k £11.20k £1.09k £1.28k £7.54k
Total expenditure £5.87k £4.71k £10.33k £35.16k £1.97k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A