Accounts and annual returns THE RICHARD ROGERS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 283252
Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 107 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 472 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 472 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 838 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 838 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window