Financial history A C O R D

Charity number: 283302
Charity is insolvent
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £9.79m £8.65m £10.06m £8.72m £7.83m
Total expenditure £9.53m £8.48m £10.02m £8.95m £7.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £133.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.00k £2.00k £5.00k £12.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £9.79m £8.65m £10.05m £8.71m £7.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.32m £8.27m £9.77m £8.79m £7.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £209.00k £212.00k £246.00k £154.00k £46.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0