Financial history LEONIVES YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 283316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.99k £11.96k £2.82k £29.09k £1.35k
Total expenditure £4.66k £7.39k £6.14k £30.71k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.65k N/A £28.58k N/A