Trustees NORTH LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 283455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Stockman | Chair | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Attwell | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ryle | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYSANDER TENNANT | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Caroline Jane Soresby | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC JAMES WELLS | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA JANE WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE BURNS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.