Trustees BASILDON HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity number: 283624
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Humphries | Chair | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Knight | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Greenhow | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Breed | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Scarfe | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Leer | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gill Howlett | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HARE | Trustee | 23 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET FLINT | Trustee | 23 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN URSELL | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA LILIAN MARGARET CLEVERLEY | Trustee | 05 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN URSELL | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE BROWN | Trustee | 30 October 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.