Trustees STALLCOMBE HOUSE
Charity number: 283877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Elizabeth Anne Masterton | Chair | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Davis-Briggs | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Todd Alan Gifford | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mark Stevens | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Murray | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK RETALLACK | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH LIVERTON | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.