Governing document PROCESSORS AND GROWERS RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/06/1956 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, UNDERTAKE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TO IMPROVE THE GROWING, HARVESTING, PROCESSING AND MARKETING OF LEGUMES, AND OTHER CROPS, AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO CARRY OUT SUCH RESEARCH AND EDUCATION AT AND FROM THE RESEARCH STATION, THORNHAUGH, NEAR PETERBOROUGH, AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.