SOUTHWICK (SUSSEX) SOCIETY

Charity number: 284197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.56k £5.34k £2.72k £4.56k £3.57k
Total expenditure £5.75k £4.56k £7.37k £3.36k £3.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A